EP0218445 - Thin film magnetic heads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.1992 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Yoshito Pat. Div. Sony Corp. 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Narisawa, Hiroaki Pat. Div. Sony Corp. 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 03 /
Wakabayashi, Noboru Pat. Div. Sony Corp. 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1987/16] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Christopher Hugo, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1987/16] | Application number, filing date | 86307484.5 | 30.09.1986 | [1987/16] | Priority number, date | JP19850218734 | 01.10.1985 Original published format: JP 21873485 | JP19850218735 | 01.10.1985 Original published format: JP 21873585 | [1987/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0218445 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0218445 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/31 | [1987/16] | CPC: |
G11B5/31 (EP,US);
G11B5/3116 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/16] | Title | German: | Dünnfilmmagnetköpfe | [1987/16] | English: | Thin film magnetic heads | [1987/16] | French: | Têtes magnétiques à films minces | [1987/16] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/10] | 07.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/41] | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP59075421 ; | [A]US4190872 (JONES ROBERT E JR [US], et al); | [Y]US4402801 (OMATA YUJI [JP], et al); | [A]US4490760 (KAMINAKA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]JPS60113312 (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 183 (P-296)(1620) 23 August 1984, & JP-A-59 075421 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 28 April 1984,, & JP59075421 A 19840428 |