EP0220848 - 7-Oxabicycloheptane substituted amide-carbamate prostaglandin analogs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc. Lawrenceville-Princeton Road Princeton, N.J. 08540-4000 / US | [1987/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakane, Masami 6-28-2C kawanahonmachi Showaku Nagoya Aichi / JP | [1987/19] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Roger Tamlyn, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1987/19] | Application number, filing date | 86307618.8 | 02.10.1986 | [1987/19] | Priority number, date | US19850789273 | 18.10.1985 Original published format: US 789273 | [1987/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0220848 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0220848 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D493/08, A61K31/557, // (C07D493/08, 307:00, 307:00) | [1987/19] | CPC: |
C07D493/08 (EP,US);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/19] | Title | German: | Substituierte 7-Oxabicyclohepta-amid-carbamat-prostaglandinanaloga | [1987/19] | English: | 7-Oxabicycloheptane substituted amide-carbamate prostaglandin analogs | [1987/19] | French: | Analogues de prostaglandine amide-carbamate 7-oxabicycloheptane substitué | [1987/19] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 11.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 30.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.05.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4526901 (NAKANE MASAMI [US]) |