EP0220015 - Emergency transfer tube closure for sealing transfer tube under emergency conditions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hardin, Roy Tyler, Jr. 1403 Clearview Drive Greenburg, PA 15601 / US | 02 /
Marshall, James Richard 1009 Evergreen Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15235 / US | [1987/18] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 86307738.4 | 07.10.1986 | [1987/18] | Priority number, date | US19850785293 | 07.10.1985 Original published format: US 785293 | [1987/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0220015 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0220015 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0220015 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G21C13/02, G21C19/18 | [1987/18] | CPC: |
G21C19/18 (EP,US);
G21C19/06 (KR);
G21C13/02 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/18] | Title | German: | Notverschluss eines Schleusenrohres zum Abdichten desselben in Notfällen | [1987/18] | English: | Emergency transfer tube closure for sealing transfer tube under emergency conditions | [1987/18] | French: | Fermeture d'urgence d'un tube de transfert pour le rendre étanche en cas d'urgence | [1987/18] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 06.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.07.1991 | GB | 17.10.1991 | ES | 28.10.1991 | CH | 31.10.1991 | LI | 31.10.1991 | [2004/03] |
Former [1993/13] | BE | 17.07.1991 | |
GB | 17.10.1991 | ||
CH | 31.10.1991 | ||
LI | 31.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/33] | BE | 17.07.1991 | |
CH | 31.10.1991 | ||
LI | 31.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/32] | BE | 17.07.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB802285 (BABCOCK & WILCOX LTD); | [A]US4028896 (WHIPPS GEORGE E); | [APD]EP0175454 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [A]US4474205 (DREYER PAUL L [US], et al); | [A]FR1337531 (LE MINISTRE DE LA DEFENSE); | [A]US4235256 (CRAWSHAY ALAN [CA]) |