EP0263206 - Enhanced bioactivity of mammalian somatotropin through selective deamidation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.1991 [1991/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo Michigan 49001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/15] | For all designated states THE UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harbour, Gary C. c/o The Upjohn Company 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo Michigan 49001 / US | 02 /
Hoogerheide, John G. c/o The Upjohn Company 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo Michigan 49001 / US | 03 /
Garlick, Robert L. c/o The Upjohn Company 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo Michigan 49001 / US | [1988/15] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/15] | Perry, Robert Edward, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 86307767.3 | 08.10.1986 | [1988/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0263206 | Date: | 13.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0263206 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07K13/00, C07K3/08, C12N15/00, C12P21/02, C12N1/20, A61K37/02 | [1988/15] | CPC: |
C07K14/61 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, GR [1988/15] | Title | German: | Erhöhte biologische Aktivität von Säugetiersomatotropin durch selektive Desamidierung | [1988/15] | English: | Enhanced bioactivity of mammalian somatotropin through selective deamidation | [1988/15] | French: | Bioactivité élevée de la somatotropine des mammifères par désamidation sélective | [1988/15] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 25.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.10.1987 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 08.10.1987 | ES   M02   Not yet paid | 08.10.1987 | GR   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0047600 [ ]; | EP0131843 [ ] |