EP0219316 - Controlling product tension in rolling mills [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 05.06.1991 [1991/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MORGAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (a Massachusetts corporation) 15 Belmont Street Worcester Massachusetts 01605 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | For all designated states MORGAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (a Massachusetts corporation) 15 Belmont Street Worcester Massachusetts 01605 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maroti, Endre S. 3 Cranbrook Road Shrewsbury Massachusetts 01545 / US | [1987/17] | Representative(s) | Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al Brookes Batchellor 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86307819.2 | 09.10.1986 | [1987/17] | Priority number, date | US19850785724 | 09.10.1985 Original published format: US 785724 | [1987/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0219316 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0219316 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0219316 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B21B37/06 | [1987/17] | CPC: |
B21B37/52 (EP,US);
B21B1/04 (KR);
B21B37/16 (KR);
B21B1/18 (EP,US);
B21B2275/04 (EP,US);
B21B39/006 (EP,US);
B21B45/0224 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1987/17] | Title | German: | Steuerung der Walzgutspannung im Walzwerk | [1987/17] | English: | Controlling product tension in rolling mills | [1987/17] | French: | Commande de la tension du matériau dans un laminoir | [1987/17] | Examination procedure | 02.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/22] | 14.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.04.1990 | NL | 11.04.1990 | [1991/23] |
Former [1991/17] | NL | 11.04.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3555862 (YOSHINO YAMATA, et al); | [AD]USRE28107E ; | [A]GB2042953 (KOCKS GMBH FRIEDRICH); | [A]EP0032766 (HOOGOVENS GROEP BV [NL]) |