EP0247263 - A device for quickly replacing a standard screwdriver tip end [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.1989 [1989/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chen, Jinn-Lih 4FL., No. 131 Guey Lin Road Taipei / TW | [1987/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/49] | Representative(s) | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 86307852.3 | 10.10.1986 | [1987/49] | Priority number, date | GB19860012947 | 28.05.1986 Original published format: GB 8612947 | [1987/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0247263 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B25F1/04, B25G1/08, B25B15/00 | [1987/49] | CPC: |
B25F1/04 (EP);
B25B15/00 (EP);
B25B15/02 (EP);
B25G1/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL [1987/49] | Title | German: | Schnellwechselvorrichtung für Normschraubenziehereinsätze | [1987/49] | English: | A device for quickly replacing a standard screwdriver tip end | [1987/49] | French: | Dispositif pour changer rapidement des pièces d'insertion pour tournevis standard | [1987/49] | File destroyed: | 23.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 04.08.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/03] | 26.08.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0152169 [ ]; | US2550775 [ ]; | US532823 [ ] |