EP0225018 - Applicator for crease setting composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.1990 [1990/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WOOL DEVELOPMENT INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 37, The Grove Ilkley, LS29 9NJ West Yorkshire / GB | For all designated states Dynic Corporation Sunshine 60 31st Floor 3-1-1 Higashi Ikebukuro Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/24] | For all designated states WOOL DEVELOPMENT INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 37, The Grove Ilkley, LS29 9NJ West Yorkshire / GB | ||
For all designated states Dynic Corporation Sunshine 60 31st Floor 3-1-1 Higashi Ikebukuro Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coulter, John Patrick 15 Parkmount Avenue Baildon Shipley West Yorksire BD17 6DS / GB | [1987/24] | Representative(s) | Wharton, Peter Robert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/24] | Wharton, Peter Robert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Inventions House Valley Court, Canal Road Bradford BD1 4SP / GB | Application number, filing date | 86307856.4 | 10.10.1986 | [1987/24] | Priority number, date | GB19850026656 | 29.10.1985 Original published format: GB 8526656 | [1987/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0225018 | Date: | 10.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0225018 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B05C17/00, A41D1/10 | [1987/24] | CPC: |
A41D1/10 (EP,US);
B05C17/015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/24] | Title | German: | Gerät zum Ausspritzen einer Mischung für dauerhafte Bügelfalten | [1987/24] | English: | Applicator for crease setting composition | [1987/24] | French: | Dispositif applicateur d'une composition fixant les plis | [1987/24] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/04] | 21.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1448519 (PYLES IND INC); | [A]US3258176 (CHESTER RACZYNSKI); | [A]GB1371662 (SPOTNAILS); | [AD]EP0067528 (WOOL DEV INT [GB]); | [A]EP0138327 (WOOL DEV INT [GB]); | [APD]GB2158159 (DYNIC CORP, et al) |