EP0227236 - Lock in which the key is moved away and isolated from the tumblers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.1990 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1990 | Change - withdrawal | published on 05.09.1990 [1990/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rabinow, Jacob 6920 Selkirk Drive Bethesda, Md. 20817 / US | [1987/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/27] | Representative(s) | Hayward, Denis Edward Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | Hayward, Denis Edward Peter, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86307992.7 | 15.10.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | US19850796070 | 08.11.1985 Original published format: US 796070 | [1987/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0227236 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0227236 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E05B21/06 | [1987/27] | CPC: |
E05B21/06 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7633 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7932 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1987/27] | Title | German: | Schloss, in dem der Schlüssel von den Zuhaltungen getrennt und isoliert wird | [1987/27] | English: | Lock in which the key is moved away and isolated from the tumblers | [1987/27] | French: | Serrure dans laquelle la clé est écartée et isolée des paillettes | [1987/27] | File destroyed: | 20.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 15.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/45] | 27.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/36] | Request for further processing for: | 12.02.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 12.02.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.03.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4485648 (RABINOW JACOB [US]); | [AD]US3172283 (JACOB RABINOW); | [AD]US2528964 (CARL LURTZ); | [AD]US2179947 (SAMUEL MILLER) |