EP0220920 - Instruction for implementing a secure computer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1987/19] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Terrence C. 169 Oak Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
Baum, Allen 2310 Cornell Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 03 /
Bryg, William R. 18630 Perego Way Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 04 /
Mahon, Michael J. 1975 Adele Place San Jose, CA 95125 / US | [1987/19] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 86308166.7 | 21.10.1986 | [1987/19] | Priority number, date | US19850792702 | 28.10.1985 Original published format: US 792702 | [1987/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0220920 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0220920 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46, G06F12/14 | [1987/19] | CPC: |
G06F9/468 (EP,US);
G06F9/45537 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/19] | Title | German: | Befehl zur Implementierung eines zuverlässigen Rechnersystems | [1987/19] | English: | Instruction for implementing a secure computer system | [1987/19] | French: | Instruction pour la mise en place d'un système d'ordinateur sûr | [1987/19] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/43] | 21.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4177510 (APPELL MARC [FR], et al) | [A] - COMPUTER DESIGN, vol. 20, no. 1, January 1981, pages 111-120, Winchester, Mass., US; S. WALLACH et al.: "32-bit minicomputer achieves full 16-bit compatibility" | by applicant | US4177510 |