EP0220947 - Polyfluoroalkylisoxazolylamines, their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.06.1995 [1995/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIONOGI & CO., LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | For all designated states SHIONOGI & CO., LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sumimoto, Shinzaburo No. 35-18, Iwazono-cho Ashiya-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Ishizuki, Ichiro No. 5-8, Tokiwadai 4-chome Toyono-cho Toyono-gun Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Kai, Hiroyuki No. 2496, Oaza-Aburahi Koka-cho Koka-gun Shiga-ken / JP | 04 /
Ueda, Shiro No.23-3-404, Takadono 3-chome Asahi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 05 /
Takase, Akira No. 15-6, Kitagoyo 4-chome Kita-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1987/19] | Representative(s) | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/09] | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A IPQ / GB | ||
Former [1987/19] | Bizley, Richard Edward BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86308261.6 | 23.10.1986 | [1987/19] | Priority number, date | JP19850238344 | 23.10.1985 Original published format: JP 23834485 | [1987/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0220947 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0220947 | Date: | 10.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0220947 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D261/14, C07D413/10, A01N43/80, A61K31/42, C07C255/33, C07D271/06, C07C255/35, C07C255/37 | [1994/24] | CPC: |
C07D271/06 (EP,US);
C07C255/00 (EP,US);
C07D261/14 (EP,US);
C07D271/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/19] | C07D261/14, C07D413/10, A01N43/80, A61K31/42, C07C121/34, C07D271/06 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1987/19] | Title | German: | Polyfluorisoxazolamine, ihre Herstellung und Anwendung | [1987/19] | English: | Polyfluoroalkylisoxazolylamines, their preparation and use | [1987/19] | French: | Polyfluoroisoxazolamines, leur préparation et utilisation | [1987/19] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1987 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 02.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP88200680.2 / EP0304966 | EP90200138.7 / EP0375670 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/23] | Request for further processing for: | 24.12.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 24.12.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.01.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2230644 (UGINE KUHLMANN [FR]); | [AD]EP0042732 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) | Examination | JPS62138484 | JPS62149655 | by applicant | US4268679 | JPS56131580 | JPS5731672 | JPS5753484 | JPS5781467 | EP0375670 | US3227725 | US3264318 | - W.R. NES; A. BARGER, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1950), vol. 72, page 5409 | - F. ELOY; R. LENAERS, CHEM. REVIEWS, (1962), vol. 62, page 155 | - NES ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1950), vol. 72, page 5409 |