EP0223449 - Method of weed control using diflufenican [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAY & BAKER LIMITED Dagenham Essex RM10 7XS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | For all designated states MAY & BAKER LIMITED Dagenham Essex RM10 7XS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hewett, Richard Henry May & Baker Limited Dagenham Essex, RM10 7XS / GB | 02 /
Veerasekaran, Ponnan May & Baker Limited Dagenham Essex, RM10 7XS / GB | [1987/22] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Stephen, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Bentham, Stephen, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1987/22] | Bentham, Stephen, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 86308378.8 | 28.10.1986 | [1987/22] | Priority number, date | GB19850026735 | 30.10.1985 Original published format: GB 8526735 | [1987/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0223449 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0223449 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/70, // (A01N43/70, 43:40) | [1987/22] | CPC: |
A01N43/70 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/70, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N43/70, A01N43/40 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Unkrautbekämpfung durch Verwendung von Diflufenican | [1987/22] | English: | Method of weed control using diflufenican | [1987/22] | French: | Procédé de lutte contre les mauvaises herbes en utilisant le diflufénican | [1987/22] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 14.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 16.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Request for further processing for: | 26.10.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 26.10.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0053011 (MAY & BAKER LTD [GB]) |