EP0221759 - Apparatus for and method of kneading dough [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHEON AUTOMATIC MACHINERY CO. LTD. 2-3, Nozawa-machi Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | For all designated states RHEON AUTOMATIC MACHINERY CO. LTD. 2-3, Nozawa-machi Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Torahiko 3-4 Nozawa-machi Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi-ken / JP | [1987/20] | Representative(s) | Boyes, Kenneth Aubrey, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | Boyes, Kenneth Aubrey, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86308396.0 | 29.10.1986 | [1987/20] | Priority number, date | JP19850242292 | 29.10.1985 Original published format: JP 24229285 | [1987/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0221759 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0221759 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0221759 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A21C1/02 | [1987/20] | CPC: |
A21C1/1455 (EP,US);
A21C1/04 (KR);
A21C1/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/20] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Kneten von Teig | [1987/20] | English: | Apparatus for and method of kneading dough | [1987/20] | French: | Appareil et méthode de pétrissage de la pâte | [1987/20] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/03] | 18.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2953460 (BAKER JOHN C); | [A]FR2131612 (LALMOLDA MADRE JOSE); | [A]GB2021964 (HEIGHT INC); | [A]FR2447965 (INST NAT RECH CHIMIQUE); | [A]CA1173024 (DOMTAR INC) |