EP0222574 - Improvements in milking machinery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DIRECTOR GENERAL OF THE MINISTRY OF AGRICULTURE AND FISHERIES Gillingham House 101-103 The Terrace Wellington / NZ | [N/P] |
Former [1987/21] | For all designated states THE DIRECTOR GENERAL OF THE MINISTRY OF AGRICULTURE AND FISHERIES Gillingham House 101-103 The Terrace Wellington / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woolford, Murray Winston 57 Berkley Avenue Hamilton / NZ | 02 /
Sherlock, Robert Alan 1 Dorothy Place Hamilton / NZ | 03 /
William, John Hugh 166 Tramway Road Hamilton / NZ | [1987/21] | Representative(s) | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al A. R. Davies & Co. 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1RQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/14] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al A. R. Davies & Co. 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1RQ / GB | ||
Former [1993/32] | Jones-Robinson, Stanley 30 St Catherine Street GB-Gloucester GL1 2BX / GB | ||
Former [1987/21] | Jones-Robinson, Stanley Sunny Bank, The Slad, Pope's Hill Newnham-on-Severn, Gloucestershire GL14 1JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 86308537.9 | 31.10.1986 | [1987/21] | Priority number, date | NZ19890002128 | 01.11.1985 Original published format: NZ 212889 | NZ20000002173 | 20.08.1986 Original published format: NZ 217300 | NZ20010002173 | 20.08.1986 Original published format: NZ 217301 | [1987/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0222574 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0222574 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0222574 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01J5/04 | [1987/21] | CPC: |
A01J5/041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, SE [1987/21] | Title | German: | Melkmaschinen | [1987/21] | English: | Improvements in milking machinery | [1987/21] | French: | Machines à traire | [1987/21] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/50] | 20.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 05.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 22.09.1992 | Appeal received | 09.11.1992 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.01.1993 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 03.04.1996 | FR | 03.04.1996 | SE | 03.07.1996 | DE | 04.07.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [1997/20] | BE | 03.04.1996 | |
SE | 03.07.1996 | ||
DE | 04.07.1996 | ||
FR | 30.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/12] | SE | 03.07.1996 | |
DE | 04.07.1996 | ||
FR | 30.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | SE | 03.07.1996 | |
DE | 04.07.1996 | ||
Former [1996/47] | SE | 03.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | US3919975 [ ] (DUNCAN LLOYD P); | FR2419013 [ ] (DEC GMBH [DE]); | DE1146304 [ ] (ALFA LAVAL AG); | US4344385 [ ] (SWANSON HAROLD V, et al) | Examination | US3469596 | FR2288459 |