EP0223488 - Flotation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.1991 [1991/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sampson, Samuel 150 Bennett Avenue New York New York 10040 / US | For all designated states Gruenspecht, Mark J. 81-16 Chevy Chase Street Jamaica New York 11432 / US | For all designated states Massbaum, Ross P.O. Box 473 East Moriches New York 11940 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | For all designated states Sampson, Samuel 150 Bennett Avenue New York New York 10040 / US | ||
For all designated states Gruenspecht, Mark J. 81-16 Chevy Chase Street Jamaica New York 11432 / US | |||
For all designated states Massbaum, Ross P.O. Box 473 East Moriches New York 11940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/22] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 86308584.1 | 04.11.1986 | [1987/22] | Priority number, date | US19850794733 | 04.11.1985 Original published format: US 794733 | US19860823085 | 27.01.1986 Original published format: US 823085 | [1987/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0223488 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0223488 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A63B31/02 | [1987/22] | CPC: |
A63B31/04 (EP);
B63C9/08 (KR);
A63B2225/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT [1987/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Schwimmen | [1987/22] | English: | Flotation device | [1987/22] | French: | Dispositif pour flotter | [1987/22] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 01.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 24.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/32] | 12.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3397414 [ ] (WEBB JOHN L); | FR1542549 [ ]; | DE2525932 [ ] (HOFFMANN MATHIAS); | US1329073 [ ] (SZILARD CZICZIRIGA); | US2556894 [ ] (AXIOTES ANTHONY A); | US1535481 [ ] (KJELGAARD GREGERS G B); | [X]FR2596659 (GALLET MARIE ANGE [FR]); | [X]US1684714 (PERRY IRA D); | [X]FR1461707 ; | [X]DE2352510 (HESSLENBERG HELMUT); | [X]US3802009 (CLEMENTE J); | [X]CH184900 (MIKES WILHELM [CH]) |