EP0226319 - Electrochemical dimerizations of pyridinium salts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1992 [1992/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REILLY INDUSTRIES, INC. 1510 Market Square Center Indianapolis Indiana 46204 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states REILLY INDUSTRIES, INC. 1510 Market Square Center Indianapolis Indiana 46204 / US | ||
Former [1987/26] | For all designated states REILLY TAR & CHEMICAL CORPORATION 1510 Market Square Center Indianapolis Indiana 46204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toomey, Joseph E., Jr. 2035 Rosedale Indianapolis Indiana 46227 / US | [1987/26] | Representative(s) | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/26] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 86308603.9 | 04.11.1986 | [1987/26] | Priority number, date | US19850797453 | 13.11.1985 Original published format: US 797453 | [1987/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0226319 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0226319 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C25B3/10 | [1987/26] | CPC: |
C25B3/29 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/26] | Title | German: | Elektrochemische Dimerisierung von Pyridiniumsalzen | [1987/26] | English: | Electrochemical dimerizations of pyridinium salts | [1987/26] | French: | Dimérisations électrochimiques de sels de pyridinium | [1987/26] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/42] | 25.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU763337 (TOMILOV ANDREJ P [SU], et al) | Examination | EP0122736 | EP0159769 |