EP0226322 - Proximity detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORMULA SYSTEMS LIMITED Oakfield Industrial Estate Eynsham Oxford 0X8 1TH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/26] | For all designated states FORMULA SYSTEMS LIMITED Oakfield Industrial Estate Eynsham Oxford 0X8 1TH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trett, John 23, Spinfield Mount Marlow Buckinghamshire / GB | 02 /
Bradbeer, Peter Frederick 21 Salt Hill Mansions Slough Berkshire SL1 3XN / GB | [1987/38] |
Former [1987/26] | 01 /
Trett, John 23 Spinfield Mount Marlow Buckinghamshire / GB | ||
02 /
Bradbeer, Peter Frederick 21 Salt Hill Mansions Slough Berkshire SL1 3XN / GB | Representative(s) | Griffin, Kenneth David, et al Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/26] | Griffin, Kenneth David, et al Saunders & Dolleymore 9, Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86308646.8 | 06.11.1986 | [1987/26] | Priority number, date | GB19850027277 | 06.11.1985 Original published format: GB 8527277 | [1987/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0226322 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0226322 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0226322 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01S15/88, G01S17/88, E05F15/00, B66B13/26, H04B3/54 | [1987/26] | CPC: |
H04B3/54 (EP,US);
B66B13/26 (EP,US);
E05F15/73 (EP,US);
G01S15/88 (EP,US);
G01S17/04 (EP,US);
G01S17/87 (EP,US);
E05F15/43 (EP,US);
E05F15/611 (EP,US);
E05F2015/433 (EP,US);
E05F2015/434 (EP,US);
E05F2015/483 (EP,US);
E05F2015/763 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/664 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/46 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/104 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5466 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/26] | Title | German: | Annäherungsdetektor | [1987/26] | English: | Proximity detector | [1987/26] | French: | Détecteur de proximité | [1987/26] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/08] | 09.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 19.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP90200586.7 / EP0380187 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04] | Request for further processing for: | 11.03.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 11.03.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.02.1994 | GR | 02.02.1994 | SE | 02.02.1994 | ES | 13.05.1994 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | BE | 02.02.1994 | |
GR | 02.02.1994 | ||
SE | 02.02.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | BE | 02.02.1994 | |
SE | 02.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/49] | BE | 02.02.1994 | |
DE | 02.02.1994 | ||
SE | 02.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | DE | 02.02.1994 | |
SE | 02.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | SE | 02.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3719938 (PERLMAN D); | [A]US3852592 (SCOVILLE A, et al); | [A]US3992102 (KAJII SHIGERU); | [A]US4029176 (MILLS GERALD W); | [A]GB2051356 (JONSSON B O); | [A]WO8202787 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US], et al); | [YD]EP0097139 (BESAM AB [SE]); | [A]EP0128513 (SICK OPTIK ELEKTRONIK ERWIN [DE]); | [Y]EP0144882 (STANLEY WORKS [US]); | [A]DE3344576 (GEZE GMBH) |