EP0223535 - Piezoelectric laser scanner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.1993 [1993/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Solcz, Edward John 3321 Tiemann Avenue New York New York 10469 / US | 02 /
Domoto, Gerald Asao 444 Sleepy Hollow Road Briarcliff Manor New York 10510 / US | 03 /
Wolf, Barry Morton 1273 Pickens Court Yorktown Heights New York 10598 / US | [1987/22] | Representative(s) | Weatherald, Keith Baynes, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | Weatherald, Keith Baynes, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1987/22] | Weatherald, Keith Baynes Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department 364 Euston Road London NW1 3BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 86308758.1 | 11.11.1986 | [1987/22] | Priority number, date | US19850798091 | 14.11.1985 Original published format: US 798091 | [1987/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0223535 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0223535 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0223535 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/10, H04N1/12 | [1987/22] | CPC: |
H04N1/1135 (EP,US);
G02B26/08 (EP,US);
G02B26/103 (EP,US);
G06K7/10653 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/22] | Title | German: | Piezoelektrischer Laserablenker | [1987/22] | English: | Piezoelectric laser scanner | [1987/22] | French: | Dispositif de balayage à laser piézoélectrique | [1987/22] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 29.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58107774 ; | [AD]US4436364 (LAUER REINHARD [DE], et al); | [A]EP0119334 (BURROUGHS CORP [US]); | [A]EP0123425 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]JPS60209718 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 214 (E-199)[1359], 21st September 1983; & JP-A-58 107 774 (YOKOGAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 27-06-1983, & JP58107774 A 00000000 |