EP0228794 - Intelligent synchronous modem and communication system incorporating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General DataComm, Inc. Straits Turnpike Route 63 Middlebury Connecticut 06762 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states General DataComm, Inc. Straits Turnpike Route 63 Middlebury Connecticut 06762 / US | ||
Former [1987/29] | For all designated states General DataComm, Inc. Straits Turnpike Route 63 Middlebury Connecticut 06762 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gorniak, Andrew M. 48 Long Meadow Road Oxford Connecticut / US | 02 /
Fargano, Michael J. 88 Blossom Drive Silverton New Jersey / US | [1987/29] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 86308889.4 | 14.11.1986 | [1987/29] | Priority number, date | US19850798897 | 18.11.1985 Original published format: US 798897 | [1987/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0228794 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0228794 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0228794 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/06, G06F13/38, G06F13/12 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
H04M11/06 (EP,US);
G06F13/385 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/32] | H04M11/06, G06F13/38 | ||
Former IPC [1987/29] | G06F13/42, H04M11/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/29] | Title | German: | Intelligentes synchrones Modem und Übertragungssystem mit diesem Modem | [1987/29] | English: | Intelligent synchronous modem and communication system incorporating the same | [1987/29] | French: | Modem synchrone intelligent et système de communication comportant ce modem | [1987/29] | Examination procedure | 02.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/10] | 30.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 01.06.1994 | NL | 01.06.1994 | SE | 01.09.1994 | ES | 12.09.1994 | [2004/03] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 01.06.1994 | |
NL | 01.06.1994 | ||
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/13] | NL | 01.06.1994 | |
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/05] | SE | 01.09.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4156796 (O'NEAL DOUGLAS M [US], et al); | [A]EP0067283 (IBM [US]) | [Y] - MINI-MICRO CONFERENCE RECORD, May 1984, pages 1-13, Northeast, New York, US; S.J. DURHAM: "Intelligent 212A-type modem component" | [A] - ELECTRONIC DESIGN, vol. 31, no. 8, April 1983, pages 93-104, Waseca, MN, Denville, NJ, US; R. ALLAN: "Data-comm, telecomm ICs-moving to single chips and more intelligence" | by applicant | - S.J. DURHAM, "Intelligent 22A-type Modem Component", MINI-MACRO CONFERENCE RECORD, (198405), pages 1 - 13 | - R. ALLAN, "Data-comm, telecomm IC's - Moving to Single Chips and more Intelligent", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, (198304), vol. 31, no. 8, pages 93 - 104 |