EP0227292 - Packaging of electrical components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.1992 [1992/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yen Wei Hsiung Block 103, Tao Ching Road 04-30 Singapore 2261 / SG | [1987/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/27] | Representative(s) | Hall, Graeme Keith, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | [1991/13] |
Former [1987/27] | Leale, Robin George FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86308938.9 | 17.11.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | GB19850029355 | 28.11.1985 Original published format: GB 8529355 | [1987/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0227292 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0227292 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0227292 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/00, B65D85/42 | [1988/02] | CPC: |
H05K13/0084 (EP);
B65D81/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/01] | H05K13/00, B65D73/02 | ||
Former IPC [1987/27] | B65D85/42, B65D73/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/27] | Title | German: | Verpackung von elektrischen Komponenten | [1987/27] | English: | Packaging of electrical components | [1987/27] | French: | Emballage des composants électriques | [1987/27] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/21] | 24.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2081226 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]US4327832 (DE MATTEO MARIO A); | [X]EP0102185 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]EP0130489 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]DE8436204U |