EP0225189 - Targeted enteral delivery system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1993 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.P. SCHERER CORPORATION West Big Beaver Road, 2075 Troy Michigan 48084 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/24] | For all designated states R.P. SCHERER CORPORATION West Big Beaver Road, 2075 Troy Michigan 48084 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davies, John Desmond 30, Newberry Place Grossepointe Farms Michigan 48236 / US | 02 /
Touitou, Elka 54, Kubovi Street Jerusalem / IL | 03 /
Rubinstein, Arnold 123, Mishmar Hayarden Street Tel Aviv / IL | [1987/24] | Representative(s) | Coleiro, Raymond, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Coleiro, Raymond, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [1987/24] | Coleiro, Raymond, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 86309305.0 | 28.11.1986 | [1987/24] | Priority number, date | IL19860000771 | 29.11.1985 Original published format: IL 77186 | [1987/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0225189 | Date: | 10.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0225189 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0225189 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/48, A61K47/00 | [1987/24] | CPC: |
A61K9/4891 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61K47/20 (EP,US);
A61K9/4858 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/24] | Title | German: | Am Zielorgan wirkendes enterales Abgabesystem | [1987/24] | English: | Targeted enteral delivery system | [1987/24] | French: | Système de libération entérique actif sur l'organe cible | [1987/24] | Examination procedure | 28.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/31] | 25.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1991 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   11.05.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 07.10.1992 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1159236 (NATTERMANN A & CIE [DE]); | [X]EP0036145 (INTERX RESEARCH CORP [US]); | [X]EP0036534 (INTERX RESEARCH CORP [US]); | [X]EP0108295 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) | Examination | EP0040590 |