EP0228206 - Method of making an integrated circuit structure having gate electrode and underlying oxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/28] | Improvements in integrated circuit structure having gate electrode and underlying oxide and method of making same | ||
[1994/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cox, William P. 570 Meadow Avenue Santa Clara California 95051 / US | 02 /
Liang, Mong-Song 792 Los Positos Dr. Milpitas California 95035 / US | [1987/28] | Representative(s) | Wright, Hugh Ronald, et al Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | Wright, Hugh Ronald, et al Brookes & Martin 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86309559.2 | 09.12.1986 | [1987/28] | Priority number, date | US19850811057 | 17.12.1985 Original published format: US 811057 | [1987/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0228206 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0228206 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0228206 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/28, H01L29/784, G11C17/00 | [1994/07] | CPC: |
H01L29/7883 (EP,US);
H01L29/40114 (EP,US);
H01L29/4916 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/28] | H01L29/60, H01L29/78, H01L21/28, // G11C17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer integrierten Schaltungsanordnung mit Gate-Elektrode und unterliegendem Oxid | [1994/07] | English: | Method of making an integrated circuit structure having gate electrode and underlying oxide | [1994/07] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'une structure de circuit intégré ayant une électrode de grille et une sous-couche d'oxyde | [1994/07] |
Former [1987/28] | Integrierte Schaltungsanordnung mit Gate-Elektrode und unterliegendem Oxid und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | ||
Former [1987/28] | Improvements in integrated circuit structure having gate electrode and underlying oxide and method of making same | ||
Former [1987/28] | Structure de circuit intégré ayant une électrode de grille et une sous-couche d'oxyde et sa méthode de fabrication | Examination procedure | 18.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/24] | 07.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.02.1994 | BE | 16.02.1994 | CH | 16.02.1994 | GR | 16.02.1994 | LI | 16.02.1994 | NL | 16.02.1994 | SE | 16.02.1994 | ES | 27.05.1994 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 16.02.1994 | |
BE | 16.02.1994 | ||
CH | 16.02.1994 | ||
GR | 16.02.1994 | ||
LI | 16.02.1994 | ||
NL | 16.02.1994 | ||
SE | 16.02.1994 | ||
Former [1995/10] | AT | 16.02.1994 | |
BE | 16.02.1994 | ||
CH | 16.02.1994 | ||
LI | 16.02.1994 | ||
NL | 16.02.1994 | ||
SE | 16.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/49] | AT | 16.02.1994 | |
BE | 16.02.1994 | ||
CH | 16.02.1994 | ||
LI | 16.02.1994 | ||
SE | 16.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/47] | AT | 16.02.1994 | |
CH | 16.02.1994 | ||
LI | 16.02.1994 | ||
SE | 16.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/46] | AT | 16.02.1994 | |
SE | 16.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | SE | 16.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP56026469 ; | [X]JP58212178 ; | [X]US4288256 (NING TAK H, et al); | [X]EP0053013 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [X]WO8302197 (NCR CO [US]); | [A]GB2130009 (RCA CORP); | [X]EP0160965 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACT OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 78 (E-58)[750], 22nd May 1981; & JP-A-56 026 469 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 14-03-1981, & JP56026469 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 63 (E-233)[1500], 24th March 1984; & JP-A-58 212 178 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 09-12-1983, & JP58212178 A 00000000 |