EP0228851 - Sound field expansion systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.1992 [1992/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitsuhashi, Takamichi C/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Tomioka, Masao C/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1987/29] | Representative(s) | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 86309734.1 | 12.12.1986 | [1987/29] | Priority number, date | JP19850285296 | 18.12.1985 Original published format: JP 28529685 | [1987/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0228851 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0228851 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0228851 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/00, G11B20/12, H04N5/92 | [1987/29] | CPC: |
H04N5/9202 (EP,US);
H04N5/95 (KR);
G11B20/00992 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/29] | Title | German: | Systeme zur Schallfeldexpansion | [1987/29] | English: | Sound field expansion systems | [1987/29] | French: | Systèmes d'expansion d'un champ sonore | [1987/29] | Examination procedure | 11.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 11.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP56053000 ; | [Y]GB2065426 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN); | [Y]EP0084969 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]GB2144942 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [A]GB1563800 (EMI LTD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 113 (E-66)[785], 22nd July 1981; & JP-A-56 053 000 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 12-05-1981, & JP56053000 A 00000000 |