EP0228852 - Accessory transmission for vehicle engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIRRAM DRIVE INC. 1435 Bonhill Road Unit 33 Mississauga Ontario L5T 1V2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | For all designated states MIRRAM DRIVE INC. 1435 Bonhill Road Unit 33 Mississauga Ontario L5T 1V2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sivalingam, K, Ramalingam 3407 Testimony Square Mississauga, Ontario L5B 3B8 / CA | [1987/29] | Representative(s) | Lambert, Hugh Richmond, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1987/29] | Application number, filing date | 86309735.8 | 12.12.1986 | [1987/29] | Priority number, date | US19850810321 | 17.12.1985 Original published format: US 810321 | [1987/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0228852 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0228852 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/44, F16H5/18, // F02B77/14 | [1987/35] | CPC: |
F02B67/00 (EP,US);
F16H1/28 (KR);
F16H3/54 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19637 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/29] | F16H3/44, // F02B77/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/29] | Title | German: | Hilfsgetriebe für einen Fahrzeugmotor | [1987/29] | English: | Accessory transmission for vehicle engines | [1987/29] | French: | Transmission accessoire pour un moteur de véhicule | [1987/29] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 03.07.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/01] | 12.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 20.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.1989 | 02.01.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.1990 | 02.01.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3295394 [ ] (WHATELEY ERIC A); | GB1378910 [ ] (GKN TRANSMISSIONS LTD); | GB1460578 [ ] (GKN TRANSMISSIONS LTD); | DE3041764 [ ] (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) |