EP0228279 - Plug-in socket assembly for integrated circuit package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1992 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.1992 [1992/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ezura, Toyokazu 305 Tanagashira Oyama-cho Suntougun Shizuoka-Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Ikeya, Kiyokazu 305 Tanagashira Oyama-cho Suntougun Shizuoka-Prefecture / JP | 03 /
Katsumata, Fujio 305 Tanagashira Oyama-cho Suntougun Shizuoka-Prefecture / JP | [1987/28] | Representative(s) | Abbott, David John, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | Abbott, David John, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 86310067.3 | 23.12.1986 | [1987/28] | Priority number, date | JP19850299100 | 31.12.1985 Original published format: JP 29910085 | [1987/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0228279 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0228279 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0228279 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/10 | [1987/28] | CPC: |
H05K7/1046 (EP,US);
Y10S439/923 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/28] | Title | German: | Fassung zum Einstecken eines IC-Bausteines | [1987/28] | English: | Plug-in socket assembly for integrated circuit package | [1987/28] | French: | Socle pour l'enfichage d'un composant à circuit intégré | [1987/28] | Examination procedure | 24.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 05.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 09.10.1991 | [1992/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0155080 (AMP INC [US]); | [A]US4533192 (KELLEY LEWIS J [US]) |