EP0195721 - Device for preventing disengagement of sliding doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRIEG ET ZIVY 10, Avenue Descartes F-92352 Le Plessis Robinson / FR | [1987/05] |
Former [1986/39] | For all designated states KRIEG ET ZIVY INDUSTRIES 10, Avenue Descartes F-92350 Le Plessis Robinson / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beauvais, Thierry 155 Boulevard Saint-Germain F-75006 Paris / FR | 02 /
Laligne, Richard 8 Square de Tocqueville F-78150 Le Chesnay / FR | [1986/39] | Representative(s) | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 95 Boulevard Beaumarchais F-75003 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86400581.4 | 19.03.1986 | [1986/39] | Priority number, date | FR19850004210 | 21.03.1985 Original published format: FR 8504210 | [1986/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0195721 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/06, E06B3/46 | [1986/39] | CPC: |
E05D15/066 (EP);
E06B3/4663 (EP);
E05D15/0656 (EP);
E05Y2201/614 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP);
E05Y2900/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, NL [1986/39] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verhindern des Aushängens von Schiebetüren | [1986/39] | English: | Device for preventing disengagement of sliding doors | [1986/39] | French: | Dispositif d'antidécrochage pour porte coulissante | [1986/39] | File destroyed: | 23.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 12.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/06] | 02.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/44] | 03.06.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA960915 ; | [A]US4193500 ; | [A]FR2256304 ; | [A]DE1269007 ; | [A]FR2251697 |