EP0198771 - Process for making laser-sensitive plastics and their use in the laser marking of articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1990 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société d'Applications Plastiques Rhône-Alpes (SAPRA) Sillans 38590 Saint-Etienne de Saint-Geoirs (Isère) / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | For all designated states Société d'Applications Plastiques Rhône-Alpes (SAPRA) Sillans F-38590 Saint-Etienne de Saint-Geoirs(Isère) / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lecomte, Gilbert 50, rue des Primevères F-38140 Rives-sur-Fure / FR | [1986/43] | Representative(s) | Fruchard, Guy, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, Rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Fruchard, Guy, et al Cabinet Boettcher 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1986/43] | Fruchard, Guy, et al CABINET BOETTCHER 23, rue la Boetie F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86400783.6 | 11.04.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | FR19850005525 | 12.04.1985 Original published format: FR 8505525 | [1986/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0198771 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198771 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/26, B41M5/24, B29C59/16, G03F3/00, A01K11/00 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
G09F3/00 (EP,US);
A01K11/001 (EP,US);
B29C59/16 (EP,US);
B41M5/267 (EP,US);
B44B7/00 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0838 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1986/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von laserempfindlichen Kunststoffen und Verwendung zur Lasermarkierung von Gegenständen | [1986/43] | English: | Process for making laser-sensitive plastics and their use in the laser marking of articles | [1986/43] | French: | Procédé pour rendre une matière plastique sensible au rayon laser et permettre son marquage au laser et article obtenu | [1986/43] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 26.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1989/39] | BE | 30.04.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5982185 ; | [A]JP5945642 ; | [A]GB2107322 (METAL BOX CO LTD); | [A]FR2546712 (HERMENAULT JEAN FRANCOIS [FR]) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 191 (M-322) [1628] 4 septembre 1984, & JP - A - 59 82 185 (TOYO GOMU KOGYO) 12-05-1984, & JP5982185 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 147, (P-285) (1584) 10 juillet 1984, & JP - A - 59 45 642 (RICOH K.K.) 14-03-1984, & JP5945642 A 00000000 |