EP0201408 - Stacking device for textile work pieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.06.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMINENCE S.A. 36 rue Florian F-30013 Nimes Cédex / FR | [1986/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tastavin, Serge 8 rue Messager F-30000 Nimes / FR | 02 /
Turquet, Didier 22 rue de la cardonille F-30730 St Mamert / FR | 03 /
Garcia, José 6 rue Montaigne F-30540 Milhaud / FR | 04 /
Frac, Bruno 9 place Gauguin Soleil Levant F-30000 Nimes / FR | [1986/46] | Representative(s) | Viard, Jean Cabinet Madeuf-Viard 56A, Rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | Viard, Jean Cabinet VIARD 28 bis, avenue Mozart F-75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86400918.8 | 25.04.1986 | [1986/46] | Priority number, date | FR19850006478 | 29.04.1985 Original published format: FR 8506478 | [1986/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0201408 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0201408 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | D05B33/02 | [1986/46] | CPC: |
D05B41/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/46] | Title | German: | Aufstapler für Textilwerkstücke | [1986/46] | English: | Stacking device for textile work pieces | [1986/46] | French: | Dispositif d'empilage de pièces textiles | [1986/46] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 12.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/33] | 13.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.02.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1989/30] | 06.03.1989 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2326525 (ROCKWELL RIMOLDI SPA [IT]); | [A]FR1571192 ; | [A]GB1021888 (PRICES TAILORS LTD); | [A]US4214541 (SUMPTER CHARLES B JR [US], et al) |