EP0205362 - Quinolyl glycinamide derivatives, process for their preparation and their pharmaceutical use as psychotropes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | For all designated states SANOFI 40, Avenue George V F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vernieres, Jean-Claude rue Sabatier Garat F-31600 Muret / FR | 02 /
Mendes, Etienne 2 place Jeanne d'Arc F-31000 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
Keane, Peter 10 avenue Winston Churchill F-31100 Toulouse / FR | 04 /
Simiand, Jacques 136 chemin de Lacombe F-31600 Muret / FR | 05 /
Morre, Michel 11 rue Sainte-Odile F-31100 Toulouse / FR | [1986/51] | Representative(s) | Bressand, Georges, et al c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | Bressand, Georges, et al c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 86400973.3 | 06.05.1986 | [1986/51] | Priority number, date | FR19850007247 | 06.05.1985 Original published format: FR 8507247 | [1986/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0205362 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0205362 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/54, C07D215/42, C07D401/12, A61K31/47 | [1986/51] | CPC: |
C07D215/54 (EP,US);
C07D215/46 (KR);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/51] | Title | German: | Chinolylglycinamidderivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und therapeutische Verwendung als Psychotrope | [1986/51] | English: | Quinolyl glycinamide derivatives, process for their preparation and their pharmaceutical use as psychotropes | [1986/51] | French: | Dérivés quinolylglycinamides, leur procédé de préparation et leur application thérapeutique en tant que psychotropes | [1986/51] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/16] | 12.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2456911 (BRUCE WILLIAM F); | [A]US3470186 (HANIFIN JOHN WILLIAM JR, et al); | [A]GB1177548 (ICI LTD [GB]); | [A]US3769410 (BERTRAND F) |