EP0245565 - Steering method for a low-velocity missile, weapon system and missile therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1992 [1992/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency 75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/47] | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency F-75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guillot, Jean 74 avenue des Quatre Chemins F-92290 Chatenay-Malabry / FR | 02 /
Marée, Michel 84 rue de la Gruerie F-91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR | 03 /
Raynaud, Jacques 64 rue René Legros F-91600 Savigny-sur-Orge / FR | 04 /
Vaillant, Robert 90, Avenue du Maine F-75007 Paris / FR | 05 /
Ansaldi, Jean 19, rue de la Peupleraie Résidence la Peupleraie F-78470 St.Remy-les-Chevreuses / FR | [1991/11] |
Former [1987/47] | 01 /
Guillot, Jean 74 avenue des Quatre Chemins F92290 Chatenay-Malabry / FR | ||
02 /
Maree, Michel 84 rue de la Gruerie F-91190 Gif-Sur-Yvette / FR | |||
03 /
Raynaud, Jacques 64 rue René Legros F-91600 Savigny-Sur-Orge / FR | |||
04 /
Vaillant, Robert 90, Avenue du Maine F-75007 Paris / FR | |||
05 /
Ansaldi, Jean 19, rue de la Peupleraie Résidence la Peupleraie F-78470 St.Remy-Les-Chevreuses / FR | Representative(s) | Bonnetat, Christian, et al Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/47] | Bonnetat, Christian, et al CABINET BONNETAT 23, Rue de St. Pétersbourg F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86401004.6 | 12.05.1986 | [1987/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0245565 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0245565 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F42B10/66, F42B12/10 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
F02K9/80 (EP);
F42B10/665 (EP);
F42B10/666 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/47] | F42B15/033, F42B13/10 | Designated contracting states | CH, LI, SE [1987/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Lenken eines Flugkörpers kleiner Geschwindigkeit sowie dazugehöriges Waffensystem und Flugkörper | [1987/47] | English: | Steering method for a low-velocity missile, weapon system and missile therefor | [1987/47] | French: | Procédé de pilotage d'un missile à faible vitesse, système d'arme et missile pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé | [1987/47] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/06] | 22.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1185193 ; | [A]US2503271 ; | [A]DE1147144 ; | [A]FR1194102 ; | [A]US4519315 ; | [A]FR2492966 ; | [A]FR1569559 ; | [A]FR2386802 |