EP0205369 - Low tension circuit breaker with a shunt effect [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERLIN GERIN Rue Henri Tarze F-38050 Grenoble Cédex / FR | [1986/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roulet-Dubonnet, Jean-Pierre 22, rue H. Berlioz Poisat F-38320 Eybens / FR | 02 /
Terracol, Claude Domaine des Angonnes F-38320 Eybens / FR | [1986/51] | Representative(s) | Kern, Paul Merlin Gerin Sce. Brevets 20, rue Henri Tarze 38050 Grenoble Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | Kern, Paul Merlin Gerin Sce. Brevets 20, rue Henri Tarze F-38050 Grenoble Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 86401048.3 | 16.05.1986 | [1986/51] | Priority number, date | FR19850008178 | 29.05.1985 Original published format: FR 8508178 | [1986/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0205369 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/00, H01H79/00 | [1986/51] | CPC: |
H01H71/002 (EP,US);
H01H79/00 (EP,US);
H01H89/06 (EP,US);
H01H9/465 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/51] | Title | German: | Niederspannungslastschalter mit Shunt-Effekt | [1986/51] | English: | Low tension circuit breaker with a shunt effect | [1986/51] | French: | Disjoncteur basse tension à effet shunt | [1986/51] | File destroyed: | 21.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 29.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/28] | 03.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/39] | 03.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1990/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1990 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2924752 (SCOTT JR WILLIAM M); | [AD]EP0042778 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]); | [A]FR2360977 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]); | [A]FR2259431 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [A]US4314300 (GRIFFITH CHARLES E) |