EP0206864 - Filter for a filtration apparatus using filter batteries [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauville, François 264, rue de la Villette Saint Pierre les Elbeuf F-76320 Caudebec-les-Elbeuf / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | For all designated states Hauville, François 264, rue de la Villette Saint Pierre les Elbeuf F-76320 Caudebec-les-Elbeuf / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/52] | Representative(s) | Armengaud Ainé, Charles, et al Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3, Avenue Bugeaud F-75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | Armengaud, Charles, et al Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3, Avenue Bugeaud F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86401114.3 | 27.05.1986 | [1986/52] | Priority number, date | FR19850008485 | 05.06.1985 Original published format: FR 8508485 | [1986/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0206864 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/30, B08B15/02, B01D46/10 | [1986/52] | CPC: |
B01D46/12 (EP);
B08B15/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/52] | Title | German: | Filter geeignet für Filtriervorrichtungen, die Filterbatterien verwenden | [1986/52] | English: | Filter for a filtration apparatus using filter batteries | [1986/52] | French: | Dispositif de filtration destiné aux installations de filtration utilisant des batteries de filtres | [1986/52] | File destroyed: | 23.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 14.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/29] | 07.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/04] | 19.08.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.06.1986 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 27.06.1986 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 27.06.1986 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 27.06.1986 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 27.06.1986 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 27.06.1986 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 27.06.1986 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 27.06.1986 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 27.06.1986 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4049406 |