EP0206893 - Process for preparing a transistion metal component for an olefin polymerization catalytic system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1990 [1990/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4/8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux Hauts-de-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brun, Claude Clos Saint Pierre Idron F-64320 Bizanos / FR | 02 /
Lacombe, Jean-Loup 24 Avenue Montilleul Résidence Estibert F-64000 Pau / FR | [1986/52] | Representative(s) | Foiret, Claude Serge, et al ELF ATOCHEM S.A., Département Propriété Industrielle, La Défense 10 92091 Paris Cédex 42 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | Foiret, Claude, et al ELF ATOCHEM S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle La Défense 10 - Cedex 42 F-92091 Paris-La-Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 86401218.2 | 05.06.1986 | [1986/52] | Priority number, date | FR19850008908 | 12.06.1985 Original published format: FR 8508908 | [1986/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0206893 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0206893 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/62, C08F4/68 | [1986/52] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
Y10S526/901 (EP,US);
Y10S526/904 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6367 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Übergangsmetallkomponente für ein Olefinpolymerisationskatalysatorsystem | [1986/52] | English: | Process for preparing a transistion metal component for an olefin polymerization catalytic system | [1986/52] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'une composante de métal de transition pour un système catalytique de polymérisation d'oléfines | [1986/52] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 10.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2950437 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [Y]EP0127530 (ATOCHEM [FR]) |