EP0208596 - Vibration damper for a towed element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 09.10.1991 [1991/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1987/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reynier, René THOMSON-CSF SCPI 19, avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
Malcor, Jean-Georges THOMSON-CSF SCPI 19, avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | 03 /
Moresco, Gilles THOMSON-CSF SCPI 19, avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | 04 /
Ramoger, François THOMSON-CSF SCPI 19, avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | [1987/03] | Representative(s) | Desperrier, Jean-Louis, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/03] | Desperrier, Jean-Louis, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 86401386.7 | 24.06.1986 | [1987/03] | Priority number, date | FR19850009892 | 28.06.1985 Original published format: FR 8509892 | [1987/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0208596 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0208596 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/56, F16F1/46, F16F7/00, H01B7/12, D07B1/00 | [1987/03] | CPC: |
F16F1/46 (EP,US);
B63B21/56 (EP,US);
D07B1/00 (EP,US);
F16F7/00 (EP,US);
H01B7/12 (EP,US);
F16F2236/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL, SE [1987/03] | Title | German: | Schwingungsdämpfer für Schleppkörper | [1987/03] | English: | Vibration damper for a towed element | [1987/03] | French: | Amortisseur de vibrations pour corps remorqué | [1987/03] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/16] | 07.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 22.08.1990 | NL | 22.08.1990 | [1991/41] |
Former [1991/34] | NL | 22.08.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB191013310 (LANCHESTER FREDERICK WILLIAM); | [A]DE675502 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG); | [A]DE724359 (ERNST NEUMANN NEANDER); | [X]CH320050 (SCHORRO ALFONS [DE]); | [X]FR1161994 (GOMMA ANTIVIBRANTI APPLIC); | [X]US2878013 (ROBERTO PIODI); | [A]US3231255 (OLSON RICHARD L); | [A]US3371311 (JACQUES CHOLET, et al); | [A]DE1623488 (KABEL METALLWERKE GHH); | [A]FR2050020 (AUTOLIV SCHWEDENGURTE); | [X]US3696325 (TALLMAN CHARLES V); | [A]FR2310498 (WESER AG [DE]); | [A]US4090168 (MILLER HOWARD A, et al); | [A]US4116153 (FISHER FREDERICK H, et al); | [X]DE3044709 (ROHRBACH BERND) |