EP0213020 - Hydropneumatic suspension for an automotive vehicle comprising anti-sagging valves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.1989 [1989/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richard, Denis 65, rue Mirabeau F-94600 Choisy-Le-Roi / FR | [1987/10] | Representative(s) | Boivin, Claude 9, rue Edouard-Charton 78000 Versailles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | Boivin, Claude 9, rue Edouard-Charton F-78000 Versailles / FR | Application number, filing date | 86401659.7 | 24.07.1986 | [1987/10] | Priority number, date | FR19850011570 | 24.07.1985 Original published format: FR 8511570 | [1987/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0213020 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0213020 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/04 | [1987/10] | CPC: |
B60G17/005 (EP);
B60G17/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1987/10] | Title | German: | Hydropneumatische Federung für Kraftfahrzeuge mit einem Gegendurchhangungsventil | [1987/10] | English: | Hydropneumatic suspension for an automotive vehicle comprising anti-sagging valves | [1987/10] | French: | Suspension hydropneumatique de véhicule automobile comportant des clapets anti-affaissement | [1987/10] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/15] | 20.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP55004268 ; | [A]US3945664 ; | [A]US3938823 ; | [A]FR1274104 ; | [A]US4145073 ; | [A]FR2391098 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 29 (M-2)[511], 14 mars 1980; & JP-A-55 004 268 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K.) 12-01-1980, & JP55004268 A 00000000 | Examination | JP554268 | - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 29 (M-2)[511], 14 mars 1980; & JP-A-55 4268 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K.) 12-01-1980, & JP554268 A 00000000 |