EP0215706 - Table tennis plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.1989 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES FORGES D'HAIRONVILLE Haironville F-55000 Bar le Duc / FR | [1987/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laborde, Félix No. 9 Lotissement l'Esprit F-52100 Saint Dizier / FR | 02 /
Huvet, Jean-Marie Chemin La Haye Le Prêtre F-55170 Baudonvillers / FR | [1987/13] | Representative(s) | Colas, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Colas, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet de Boisse 37, avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86401936.9 | 03.09.1986 | [1987/13] | Priority number, date | FR19850013106 | 04.09.1985 Original published format: FR 8513106 | [1987/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0215706 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A47B25/00, B32B15/08, A47B95/04 | [1987/13] | CPC: |
A47B25/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/13] | Title | German: | Tischtennisplatte | [1987/13] | English: | Table tennis plate | [1987/13] | French: | Plateau pour jeu de tennis de table | [1987/13] | File destroyed: | 25.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 15.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/38] | 19.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/40] | 03.05.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1989/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]FR2240029 ; | [Y]US3386218 ; | [Y]DE1303270 ; | [Y]US3235040 ; | [A]US4320614 |