EP0219377 - Process for the preparation of spherical paracetamol agglomerates and products obtained thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.1988 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC SANTE Les Miroirs 18 Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC SANTE Les Miroirs 18 Avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Proton, Hubert 100 Waverley Appt. 6 Ottawa (Ontario)K2P OV2 / CA | [1987/17] | Representative(s) | Pilard, Jacques, et al RHONE-POULENC RECHERCHES Service Brevets Pharma 25, Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | Pilard, Jacques, et al RHONE-POULENC RECHERCHES Service Brevets Pharma 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 86401942.7 | 04.09.1986 | [1987/17] | Priority number, date | FR19850013210 | 05.09.1985 Original published format: FR 8513210 | [1987/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0219377 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/165, A61K9/16 | [1987/17] | CPC: |
A61K31/165 (EP);
A61K9/1688 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung sphärischer Paracetamolagglomerate sowie die entsprechenden Produkte | [1987/17] | English: | Process for the preparation of spherical paracetamol agglomerates and products obtained thereby | [1987/17] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'agglomerats sphériques de paracétamol et produits obtenus | [1987/17] | File destroyed: | 23.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 21.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 14.07.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2221178 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [Y]FR2187312 (BLUM JEAN [FR]); | [A]DE2416903 (BAYER AG) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 2, juillet 1984, page 294, no. 12086z, Columbus, Ohio, US; Y. KAWASHIMA et al.: "Development of spherical crystallization technique for a particle design method", & FUNTAI KOGAKU KAISHI 1983, 20(12), 759-62 |