EP0239706 - Improved two-component polyurethanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/41] | Two-component polyurethanes | ||
[1990/01] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CECA S.A. 4 - 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | For all designated states CECA S.A. 4 - 8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [1988/45] | For all designated states CECA S.A. 22, Place des Vosges F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1987/41] | For all designated states CECA S.A. (Société Anonyme) 12-16 allée des Vosges F-92062 Courbevoie Paris la Défense Cédex 54 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vandermeersch, Jean 45, rue Edouard Vaillant F-93100 Montreuil / FR | 02 /
Durand, Guy 118, avenue Jean-Jaurès F-75019 Paris / FR | [1987/41] | Representative(s) | Treuil, Claude, et al ARKEMA Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Treuil, Claude, et al Atofina Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8 cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/03] | Ohresser, François Elf Atochem S.A. Direction Centrale Recherche & Développement Département Propriété Industrielle Cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1992/17] | Haicour, Philippe ELF ATOCHEM S.A., D.P.I. 4-8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 - Cédex 42 F-92091 Paris La Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 86402042.5 | 18.09.1986 | [1987/41] | Priority number, date | FR19850013951 | 20.09.1985 Original published format: FR 8513951 | [1987/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0239706 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0239706 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, H01B3/30, C08K3/34 | [1987/41] | CPC: |
H01B3/302 (EP,US);
C08G18/0885 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/41] | Title | German: | Verbesserte Zweikomponenten-Polyurethane | [1990/01] | English: | Improved two-component polyurethanes | [1990/01] | French: | Perfectionnements pour polyurethanes à deux composants | [1987/41] |
Former [1987/41] | Polyurethane mit zwei Komponenten | ||
Former [1987/41] | Two-component polyurethanes | Examination procedure | 13.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/51] | 19.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.1990
31.03.2000
WITHDRAWN Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | 02
02.10.1990
23.10.1990
ADMISSIBLE Grace GmbH Erlengang 31 D-22844 Norderstedt / DE Opponent's representative Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.1990
23.10.1990
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
02
02.10.1990
23.10.1990
ADMISSIBLE Grace GmbH Erlengang 31 D-22844 Norderstedt / DE Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [1998/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.1990
23.10.1990
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE Opponent's representative Rau, Manfred Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02
02.10.1990
23.10.1990
ADMISSIBLE Grace GmbH Erlengang 31 D-22844 Norderstedt / DE Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [1990/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.1990
23.10.1990
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
02
02.10.1990
23.10.1990
ADMISSIBLE Grace GmbH Erlengang 31 D-22844 Norderstedt / DE Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | 13.11.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.03.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.03.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 31.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 15.09.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.11.2000 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 21.08.2003 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/48] | Appeal following opposition | 09.01.2001 | Appeal received No. T0019/01 | 02.03.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.07.2003 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 01.02.1994 | Appeal received No. T0097/94 | 21.03.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.07.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 14.08.2001 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2001/33] | 10.10.2001 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2001/41] | 15.07.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.07.1997 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 08.09.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 29.09.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.11.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.10.1986 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   22.12.1986 | 20.10.1986 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   22.12.1986 | 20.10.1986 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   22.12.1986 | 20.10.1986 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   22.12.1986 | 20.10.1986 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   22.12.1986 | 20.10.1986 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   22.12.1986 | 20.10.1986 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   22.12.1986 | 20.10.1986 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   22.12.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1321178 (BAYER AG); | [AD]FR2001359 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [A]DE1928129 (BAYER AG) |