EP0226493 - Activated filler sand, its preparation process and its use in making hot-mixes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENTREPRISE JEAN LEFEBVRE 11, Bld Jean-Mermoz B.P. 139 F-92202 Neuilly-sur-Seine Cédex / FR | [1987/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vivier, Maurice 11, rue Peclet F-75015 Paris / FR | [1987/26] | Representative(s) | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/26] | Ahner, Francis, et al CABINET REGIMBEAU 26, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86402500.2 | 10.11.1986 | [1987/26] | Priority number, date | FR19850016693 | 12.11.1985 Original published format: FR 8516693 | [1987/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0226493 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0226493 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E01C7/18, E01C3/00, C08L95/00, E02B3/12 | [1987/26] | CPC: |
E01C7/182 (EP);
C08L95/00 (EP);
E01C3/003 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08L2666/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/26] | Title | German: | Aktivierter Füllersand, Verfahren zu seiner Vorbereitung und seine Verwendung zum Herstellen von Heissmischgut | [1987/26] | English: | Activated filler sand, its preparation process and its use in making hot-mixes | [1987/26] | French: | Sable fillérisé activé, son procédé de préparation et son application à la fabrication d'enrobés à chaud | [1987/26] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 28.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.04.1990 | GB | 11.04.1990 | GR | 11.04.1990 | IT | 11.04.1990 | NL | 11.04.1990 | SE | 11.04.1990 | [2007/52] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 11.04.1990 | |
GB | 11.04.1990 | ||
GR | 11.04.1990 | ||
IT | 11.04.1990 | ||
NL | 11.04.1990 | ||
SE | 11.04.1990 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 11.04.1990 | |
GB | 11.04.1990 | ||
IT | 11.04.1990 | ||
NL | 11.04.1990 | ||
SE | 11.04.1990 | ||
Former [1991/17] | AT | 11.04.1990 | |
GB | 11.04.1990 | ||
NL | 11.04.1990 | ||
SE | 11.04.1990 | ||
Former [1991/11] | GB | 11.04.1990 | |
SE | 11.04.1990 | ||
Former [1990/50] | SE | 11.04.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE2830795 (TEERBAU GMBH STRASSENBAU) | [A] - BITUMEN, vol. 35 no. 4, 1973, page 112, Hambourg, DE; A.A. TIMOFEJEW: "Wiederverwendung von Asphaltbeton" |