EP0230171 - Process and apparatus for the continuous manufacture of lithium by electrolysis of lithium chloride [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.1991 [1991/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1987/31] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC SPECIALITES CHIMIQUES "Les Miroirs" 18, Avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leroux, Eric 17, rue Labois-Rouillon F-75019 Paris / FR | 02 /
Nataf, Philippe 7, avenue des Cèdres F-92410 Ville d'Avray / FR | 03 /
Jacubert, Serge 12, rue Jules Herbron F-78220 Viroflay / FR | [1987/31] | Representative(s) | Esson, Jean-Pierre, et al Rhône-Poulenc Interservices Service Brevets Chimie 25 Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | Esson, Jean-Pierre, et al Rhône-Poulenc Interservices Service Brevets Chimie 25, quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1987/31] | Fabre, Madeleine-France RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Service Brevets Chimie 25, quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 86402645.5 | 28.11.1986 | [1987/31] | Priority number, date | FR19850018483 | 13.12.1985 Original published format: FR 8518483 | [1987/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0230171 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0230171 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C25C3/02 | [1987/31] | CPC: |
C25C3/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [1987/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur kontinuierlichen Herstellung von Lithium durch Elektrolyse von Lithiumchlorid | [1987/31] | English: | Process and apparatus for the continuous manufacture of lithium by electrolysis of lithium chloride | [1987/31] | French: | Procédé et Appareillage pour la préparation en continu de lithium par électrolyse du chlorure de lithium | [1987/31] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/06] | 01.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2755244 (HARVEY CLARENCE C); | [AD]EP0156668 (RHONE POULENC SPEC CHIM [FR]) |