EP0230810 - Fast control circuit for a power-field-effect transistor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1992 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1992 [1992/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-LGT LABORATOIRE GENERAL DES TELECOMMUNICATIONS 1, rue de l'Hautil 78700 Conflans-Sainte Honorine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | For all designated states THOMSON-LGT LABORATOIRE GENERAL DES TELECOMMUNICATIONS 1, rue de l'Hautil F-78700 Conflans-Sainte Honorine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nollet, Michel THOMSON-CSF SCPI 19, avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | [1987/32] | Representative(s) | Lincot, Georges, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle, Département Brevets, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | Lincot, Georges, et al THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 86402731.3 | 09.12.1986 | [1987/32] | Priority number, date | FR19850018526 | 13.12.1985 Original published format: FR 8518526 | [1987/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0230810 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0230810 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/04 | [1987/32] | CPC: |
H03K17/691 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/32] | Title | German: | Schnelle Steuerschaltung für Leistungs-Feldeffekttransistoren | [1987/32] | English: | Fast control circuit for a power-field-effect transistor | [1987/32] | French: | Circuit de commande rapide de transistors à effet de champ de puissance | [1987/32] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/05] | 22.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0053709 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]DE3243660 (ZUMTOBEL AG [AT]) |