EP0231705 - Monitoring device for boiler functions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1993 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE CHAUDIERES AUTOMATIQUES EN ACIER SECCACIER 12, rue Copreaux 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | For all designated states SOCIETE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE CHAUDIERES AUTOMATIQUES EN ACIER SECCACIER 12, rue Copreaux F-75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1987/33] | For all designated states Brunel, Gérald 3, rue Traversière F-42000 Saint Etienne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brunel, Gérald 29 rue André Gide F-75015 Paris / FR | [1990/46] |
Former [1987/33] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Cabinet HERRBURGER 67 avenue Niel 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | Cabinet Pierre HERRBURGER 115, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1987/33] | Cabinet Pierre HERRBURGER 115, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86402905.3 | 23.12.1986 | [1987/33] | Priority number, date | FR19850019491 | 31.12.1985 Original published format: FR 8519491 | [1987/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0231705 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0231705 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/00 | [1987/33] | CPC: |
F23N5/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/33] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Überwachung der Arbeitsweise eines Heizkessels | [1987/33] | English: | Monitoring device for boiler functions | [1987/33] | French: | Installation de surveillance du fonctionnement d'une chaudière | [1987/33] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1987 | New documents discovered [1987/46] | 11.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 24.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.01.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.03.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.03.1992 | GB | 11.03.1992 | IT | 11.03.1992 | NL | 11.03.1992 | SE | 11.03.1992 | ES | 22.06.1992 | [2004/03] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 11.03.1992 | |
GB | 11.03.1992 | ||
IT | 11.03.1992 | ||
NL | 11.03.1992 | ||
SE | 11.03.1992 | ||
Former [1993/14] | AT | 11.03.1992 | |
GB | 11.03.1992 | ||
NL | 11.03.1992 | ||
SE | 11.03.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | AT | 11.03.1992 | |
NL | 11.03.1992 | ||
SE | 11.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/48] | NL | 11.03.1992 | |
SE | 11.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/47] | SE | 11.03.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59180218 ; | FR2295354 [ ] (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]); | GB2080547 [ ] (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | EP0156200 [ ] (RUHRGAS AG [DE]) | [A] - ADVANCES IN INSTRUMENTATION, vol. 39, 22-25 octobre 1984, partie 1, pages 59-66, ISA, Research Triangle Park, Pittsburgh, US; R.J. ST. ONGE: "Carbon monoxide air to fuel bias control on utility boilers" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 38 (M-358)[1761], 19 février 1985; & JP-A-59 180 218 (BABCOCK HITACHI K.K.) 13-10-1984, & JP59180218 A 00000000 | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE INSTITUTE OF FUEL, vol. 34, no. 242, mars 1961, pages 119-122, Londres, GB; E. JOHNSON: "Automatic combustion control on a travelling-grate boiler by oxygen analysis of flue gas" | Examination | DE1253205 |