EP0189358 - N-(phosphonomethylglycyl) sulfonyl amine-type herbicides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1989 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC AGROCHIMIE 14-20, rue Pierre Baizet 69009 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC AGROCHIMIE 14-20, rue Pierre Baizet F-69009 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borrod, Guy 38 bis rue des Granges F-69005 Lyon / FR | 02 /
Lacroix, Guy 332 F Balmont La Duchère F-69009 Lyon / FR | [1986/31] | Representative(s) | Brachotte, Charles, et al RHONE-POULENC AGROCHIMIE Département Propriété Industrielle B.P. 9163 F-69263 Lyon Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | Brachotte, Charles, et al RHONE-POULENC AGROCHIMIE Département Propriété Industrielle B.P. 9163 F-69263 Lyon Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 86420012.6 | 10.01.1986 | [1986/31] | Priority number, date | FR19850000619 | 14.01.1985 Original published format: FR 8500619 | [1986/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0189358 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0189358 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/40, A01N57/18 | [1986/31] | CPC: |
A01N57/22 (EP,US);
C07F9/4006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/31] | Title | German: | N-(Phosphonomethylglycyl)-Sulfonylamine-ähnliche Herbizide | [1986/31] | English: | N-(phosphonomethylglycyl) sulfonyl amine-type herbicides | [1986/31] | French: | Herbicides de type N-(phosphonométhylglycyl) sulfonylamines | [1986/31] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/31] | 29.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.01.1989 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3910969 (FRANZ JOHN E); | [E]EP0135454 (RHONE POULENC AGROCHIMIE [FR]) |