EP0198778 - Machine for the application of a treatment product to a wood, metal or plastic beam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aguettant, Jean Christophe 63 rue Montgolfier F-69006 Lyon / FR | For all designated states Guillot, Roger 10 rue Corneille F-69150 Decines / FR | [1986/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/43] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Bernard, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 20, boulevard E. Deruelle B.P. 3011 69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | Maureau, Bernard, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 20, boulevard E. Deruelle B.P. 3011 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 86420100.9 | 15.04.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | FR19850006176 | 16.04.1985 Original published format: FR 8506176 | [1986/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0198778 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198778 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B05B15/04, B05C3/20, B05D1/32 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
B05D1/32 (EP,US);
B05B12/16 (EP,US);
B05B12/18 (EP,US);
B05C3/20 (EP,US);
Y10S118/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/43] | Title | German: | Maschine zum Auftragen eines Behandlungsmittels auf ein Profil, z.B. aus Holz, Metall oder Kunststoff | [1986/43] | English: | Machine for the application of a treatment product to a wood, metal or plastic beam | [1986/43] | French: | Machine pour l'application d'un produit de traitement sur des profilés en bois, métal, matière plastique ou autres | [1986/43] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/06] | 11.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.04.1989 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2219127 (MITSUI SHIPBUILDING ENG [JP]); | [A]GB2145442 (UNIVERSAL WOOD PRODUCTS MACHIN) |