EP0210937 - Process for the preparation of calcium fluosilicate as a starting material for obtaining pure calcium fluoride and a pure fluosilicic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALUMINIUM PECHINEY 23, rue Balzac 75008 Paris Cédex 08 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | For all designated states ALUMINIUM PECHINEY 23, rue Balzac F-75008 Paris Cédex 08 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siegneurin, Laurent 3, avenue du Parc F-30340 Salindres / FR | [1987/06] | Representative(s) | Pascaud, Claude, et al PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel 69433 Lyon Cédex 3 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | Pascaud, Claude, et al PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel F-69433 Lyon Cédex 3 / FR | Application number, filing date | 86420204.9 | 24.07.1986 | [1987/06] | Priority number, date | FR19850011919 | 26.07.1985 Original published format: FR 8511919 | [1987/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0210937 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/10, C01F11/22, C01B33/107 | [1987/06] | CPC: |
C01B33/103 (EP,US);
C01B33/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Kalziumfluosilikat als Ausgangsmaterial zur Gewinnung von reinem Kalziumfluorid und reiner Kieselfluorwasserstoffsäure | [1987/06] | English: | Process for the preparation of calcium fluosilicate as a starting material for obtaining pure calcium fluoride and a pure fluosilicic acid | [1987/06] | French: | Procédé de préparation de fluosilicate de calcium comme matière première pour l'obtention de fluorure de calcium et d'acide fluosilicique pur | [1987/06] | File destroyed: | 02.07.1993 | Examination procedure | 13.01.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR626656 |