EP0198779 - Drawing device for forming a tube starting from a metal strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shahum, Christian 45, Boulevard Baptistin Cayol Bât. H. "Le Tiboulen" F-13008 Marseille / FR | [1986/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ketanedjian, Annie, épouse Shahum 45, Boulevard Baptistin Cayol Bât. H."Le Tiboulen" F-13008 - Marseille / FR | [1986/43] | Representative(s) | Moretti, René, et al c/o Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE "Prado-Mermoz" 232, Avenue du Prado 13008 Marseille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | Moretti, René, et al c/o Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE "Prado-Mermoz" 232, Avenue du Prado F-13008 Marseille / FR | Application number, filing date | 86430010.8 | 14.04.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | FR19850005914 | 17.04.1985 Original published format: FR 8505914 | [1986/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0198779 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0198779 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198779 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B21D5/06, B21D11/06 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
B21D5/06 (EP,US);
B21D11/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/43] | Title | German: | Zieheisenvorrichtung zum Formen von Rohren aus einem Metallband | [1986/43] | English: | Drawing device for forming a tube starting from a metal strip | [1986/43] | French: | Dispositif de filière pour former du tube à partir d'un ruban métallique | [1986/43] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/18] | 19.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.06.1991 | NL | 26.06.1991 | SE | 26.06.1991 | [1992/15] |
Former [1992/09] | NL | 26.06.1991 | |
SE | 26.06.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | SE | 26.06.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE597120 (KARL BREITENBACH, et al); | [A]DE670145 (PFORZHEIM METALLSCHLAUCH); | [X]US2229149 (KARL WACKER); | [A]US3001569 (GRADT RICHARD A); | [Y]US3225579 (CHAMBERS ISAAC M); | [A]US3415089 (FERCHLAND HAROLD W); | [X]US3970233 (SUCHECKI JOSEF); | [A]FR2507447 (GORI & ZUCCHI SPA [IT]) |