EP0193487 - Chaff deploying apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.1986 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOODYEAR AEROSPACE CORPORATION 1210 Massillon Road Akron, OH 44315 / US | [1986/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gibbs, Robert L. 2255 Winter Parkway Cuyahoga Falls Ohio 44221 / US | [1986/36] | Representative(s) | Weyland, J.J. Pierre Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | Weyland, J.J. Pierre Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 86630029.6 | 03.03.1986 | [1986/36] | Priority number, date | US19850707330 | 01.03.1985 Original published format: US 707330 | [1986/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0193487 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/36] | Classification | IPC: | F41F5/02 | [1986/36] | CPC: |
F42B5/15 (EP,US);
F42B12/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/36] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verteilen von Düppeln | [1986/36] | English: | Chaff deploying apparatus | [1986/36] | French: | Dispositif pour déployer des leurres | [1986/36] | File destroyed: | 18.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 14.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/36] | 06.10.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |