EP0199665 - Reverse sum quench measurement using a liquid scintillation counter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1991 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1991 [1991/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Packard Instrument Company, Inc. 2200 Warrenville Road Downers Grove, IL 60515 / US | [1986/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jones, Donald K. 903 Santuit Court Schaumburg Illinois 60194 / US | 02 /
Tomisek, John David 9822 S. Lawndale Avenue Evergreen Park Illinois 60642 / US | 03 /
Young, Harry Major 739 Prospect Barrington Illinois 60010 / US | [1986/44] | Representative(s) | McCallum, William Potter, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | McCallum, William Potter, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1987/21] | McCallum, William Potter MARKS & CLERK 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1986/44] | Waxweiler, Jean Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 86630052.8 | 03.04.1986 | [1986/44] | Priority number, date | US19850721265 | 08.04.1985 Original published format: US 721265 | [1986/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0199665 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0199665 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/204 | [1986/44] | CPC: |
G01T1/204 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1986/44] | Title | German: | Rückläufige Summenbildung bei dem Quench-Effekt in einem Flüssigszintillationszähler | [1986/44] | English: | Reverse sum quench measurement using a liquid scintillation counter | [1986/44] | French: | Mesure de l'affaiblissement par totalisation en sens inverse pour compteur à scintillateur liquide | [1986/44] | Examination procedure | 03.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/23] | 02.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 18.07.1990 | [1991/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3381130 (NATHER ROY E); | [X]US3715584 (ROSENSTINGL E) | [A] - INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF APPLIED RADIATION AND ISOTOPES, vol. 35, no. 12, December 1984, pages 1103-1112, Oxford, GB; B.M. COURSEY et al.: "Standardization of technetium-99 by liquid-scintillation counting" |