EP0227583 - Pressurized manual advancement dilatation catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOGARTY, Thomas J. 770 Welch Road Suite 201 Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [1987/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chin, Albert K. 340 Alexander Avenue Redwood City California 94061 / US | [1987/27] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 86630201.1 | 22.12.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | US19850812384 | 23.12.1985 Original published format: US 812384 | [1987/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0227583 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0227583 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0227583 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/02 | [1987/27] | CPC: |
A61M25/0119 (EP,US);
A61M25/10 (US);
A61M25/104 (EP,US);
A61M25/10184 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/27] | Title | German: | Manuell durch Druckerzeugung ausdehnbarer Dilatationskatheter | [1987/27] | English: | Pressurized manual advancement dilatation catheter | [1987/27] | French: | Cathéter dilatable avec avancement manuel sous pression | [1987/27] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 31.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.03.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4271839 (FOGARTY THOMAS J, et al); | [A]US4318410 (CHIN ALBERT K) |