EP0230850 - Impulse high voltage generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1994 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.1994 [1994/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakayama, Yutaka c/o Kobe Shipyard & Engine Works Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 1-1, Wadasaki-sho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe City Hyogo Pref. / JP | 02 /
Tomimatsu, Kazutaka c/o Kobe Shipyard & Engine W. Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 1-1, Wadasaki-sho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe City Hyogo Pref. / JP | [1993/52] |
Former [1987/32] | 01 /
Nakayama, Yutaka c/o Kobe Shipyard & Engine Works Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 1-1, Wadasaki-sho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe City Hyogo Pref. / JP | ||
02 /
Tomimatsu, Kazutaka c/o Kobe Shipyard & Engine Wor Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 1-1, Wadasaki-sho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe City Hyogo Pref. / JP | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 D-14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1987/32] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 86730111.1 | 15.07.1986 | [1987/32] | Priority number, date | JP19860016741 | 30.01.1986 Original published format: JP 1674186 | JP19860085591U | 05.06.1986 Original published format: JP 8559186 U | [1987/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0230850 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0230850 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0230850 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H03K3/53, H02M9/06 | [1987/32] | CPC: |
B03C3/68 (EP,US);
B03C3/00 (KR);
H03K3/53 (EP,KR,US);
H03K3/537 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1987/32] | Title | German: | Hochspannungsimpulsgenerator | [1987/32] | English: | Impulse high voltage generator | [1987/32] | French: | Générateur d'impulsions de haute tension | [1987/32] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 24.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/47] | 20.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59063986 ; | [A]DE1959134 (SCHRACK ELEKTRIZITAETS AG E); | [A]DE3447719 (MASUDA SENICHI) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 167 (E-258)(1604) 2nd August 1984; & JP-A-59 063 986 (MASUDA) 11-04-1984, & JP59063986 A 00000000 |