EP0204655 - Cleaning device for damping rollers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.03.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grafo Pabst Pfaffächerstrasse CH-8913 Ottenbach / CH | [1986/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pabst, Oskar Pfaffächerstrasse 45 CH-8913 Ottenbach / CH | [1986/50] | Representative(s) | Münch, Otto, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2008/44] |
Former [1986/50] | White, William, et al Patentanwalts-Bureau Isler AG Postfach 6940 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 86810186.6 | 25.04.1986 | [1986/50] | Priority number, date | CH19850002347 | 03.06.1985 Original published format: CH 234785 | [1986/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0204655 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0204655 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B41F35/00 | [1986/50] | CPC: |
B41F35/002 (EP);
B41F35/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/50] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Reinigen von Feuchtwalzen | [1986/50] | English: | Cleaning device for damping rollers | [1986/50] | French: | Dispositif de nettoyage des rouleaux de mouillage | [1986/50] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 09.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/28] | 24.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/17] | 09.12.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 08.09.1990 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: applicant has died | [1990/45] | 11.06.1993 | Resumption of proceedings | [1993/20] | 08.09.1990 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: applicant has died | [1993/20] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1159380 ; | [Y]US3999239 ; | [Y]DE2951369 ; | [Y]GB2040811 |